HI HB678 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB678

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes La Kuokoa, Hawaiian Recognition Day, as an official state holiday. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Holidays.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB678 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback