HI HB678 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires collective bargaining for charter school matters to be conducted between the exclusive representatives of charter school employees as the employee and the governor, board of education, and representatives elected by charter school governing boards as the employer.
Title
Charter Schools; Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB837 (Same As) 2015-02-13 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=678&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB678_.HTM |