HI HB678 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Hawaii tourism authority to submit annual budget to legislature for approval. Requires expenditure caps on marketing, product development, and administration. Allows adjustment within each of the 3 categories, but not to exceed approved respective maximum expenditure limits.
Title
Hawaii Tourism Authority; Budget; Submit to Legislature
Sponsors
Rep. Lyla Berg [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-09. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Saturday, 02-07-09 9:00am in conference room 312. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-07-09. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 02-02-09 8:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=678&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB678_.HTM |