HI HB677 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB677
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the pool of orthodontists who are eligible to perform medically necessary orthodontic services for treatment of certain orofacial anomalies covered by health insurance.
Title
Relating To Health Care Practitioners.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB528 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB677 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB677 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=677&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB677_.HTM |