HI HB671 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB671
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the ohana zones pilot program, including expenses relating to operations, upkeep of facilities, provision of services, and administrative costs. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for the construction or rehabilitation of facilities that will result in new units for the ohana zones pilot program. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Ohana Zones.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi, Todd. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HLT on Friday, 02-10-23 11:15AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HSG/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1442 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
HB671 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HB671 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=671&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB671_HD1_.HTM |