HI HB666 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB666

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a private cause of action for persons injured by the deprivation of rights under the United States Constitution or the Hawaii Constitution by law enforcement officers. Requires that employers of law enforcement officers indemnify officers for judgments or settlements arising from that cause of action over a certain amount. Requires political subdivisions of the State who employ law enforcement officers to publicly disclose a list of officers against whom a judgment or settlement is entered as well as the amount of the judgment or settlement and any disciplinary actions or criminal charges brought against the officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Law Enforcement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB783 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB666 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback