HI HB665 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 251, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 251, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a health care provider shall not be required to consult the electronic prescription accountability system for patients when the prescription will be directly administered under the supervision of a health care provider, provided that the system is consulted when the patients are initially admitted at a hospital, for patients in post-operative care with a prescription limited to a three-day supply, or for patients with a terminal disease receiving hospice or other palliative care. (HB665 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Electronic Prescription Accountability System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 251, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 251, on 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 43). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 43) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, C. Lee, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, C. Lee, Takumi Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ward. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 676) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1857) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 396). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB807 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).