HI HB659 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts civil asset forfeiture to cases involving the commission of a felony offense where the property owner has been convicted of an underlying felony offense. Directs any forfeiture proceeds to the general fund.
Title
Relating To Property Forfeiture.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB294 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
HB659 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB659 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=659&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB659_.HTM |