HI HB658 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB658

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows students who experienced educational disruption to graduate high school through enrollment in an accepted alternative education program and participation in certain activities approved by the department of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2023-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-07-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-27HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
2023-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB658 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB603 (Same As) 2023-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback