HI HB658 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for one veterans' counselor position for the Maui office of the office of veterans' services. Takes effect July 1, 2020. (HB658 HD1)
Title
Maui Office of Veterans' Services; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Lyla Berg [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] |
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Rep. Roland Sagum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-24 | (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-09 1:30 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to PSM, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 142). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-02-09 11:30am in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-19-09 9:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |