HI HB654 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the issuance of citations and cease and desist orders in cases where an investigator personally observes and determines that a person is acting as a contractor without a license in good standing. Amends penalties. Effective 01/01/2030. (HB654 HD1)
Title
Contractors; License Requirements; Citations; Civil Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 141). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Herkes, Luke, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Thielen; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-09 2:00 PM in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-09. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC-JUD on Monday, 02-02-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |