HI HB653 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB653
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes tips or gratuities paid directly to an individual by a customer of the employer and reported or declared to the employer under the definition of income used to calculate payments of child or spousal support.
Title
Relating To Payments Of Support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB631 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB653 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB653 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=653&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB653_.HTM |