HI HB652 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a state income tax credit for certain expenses paid or incurred by school teachers, special education teachers, school librarians, and counselors for supplementary materials used in the classroom, as well as expenses incurred while accompanying students on educational trips.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Teachers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback