HI HB650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB650
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a teacher retention advisory board within the Department of Education for administrative purposes to study and make recommendations regarding teacher retention and recruitment in the State. Requires the advisory board to design a teacher mentorship pilot program to be administered by the Department of Education during the 2019-2020, 2020-2021, and 2021-2022 school years. Requires the Department of Education to conduct detailed exit interviews with teachers who voluntarily leave the employ of the department. Requires annual reports to the legislature. (HB650 HD1)
Title
Relating To Teacher Retention.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 500) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-02-05 | House | Re-referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 14 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB650 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).