HI HB649 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the teacher home assistance program within HHFDC to provide housing vouchers to full-time DOE teachers (including public charter school teachers) who teach in hard-to-fill schools and whose household income does not exceed eighty percent of the area's median income. (HB649 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Teacher Housing Subsidies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-05HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Hashimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to HSG, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback