HI HB643 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB643
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Finance to issue general obligation bonds to finance capital improvements to the Waiahole Irrigation System.
Title
Relating To Irrigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 139). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 875), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 354), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-01 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB643 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB684 (Same As) 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB684 (Same As) 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=643&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB643_.HTM |