HI HB642 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB642
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to PDP/LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to PDP/LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a hotel employer to recall the same number of employees in substantially the same classification as the employer's active workforce as of 3/1/2020. Requires certain laid-off employees to be offered job positions as they become available, under certain terms and conditions. Prohibits an employer from retaliatory actions against employees who exercise their right to recall. Establishes the rights of employers and employees under the right of recall law.
Title
Relating To Employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to PDP/LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB642 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to PDP/LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB588 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/LCA, JDC.
SB588 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/LCA, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=642&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB642_.HTM |