HI HB641 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB641
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for a feasibility and cost study relating to the construction of a new boat ramp and pier in Puna.
Title
Relating To Puna.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB641 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
SB472 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB472 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=641&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB641_.HTM |