HI HB637 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 141, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 141, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Building Code Council to adopt codes or standards within two years of official publication, otherwise automatic adoption into Hawaii State Building Code will occur until such adoption is effectuated. Deletes requirement for Council adoption of new model building codes within 18 months of official publication date. Authorizes Council to receive private funds for code adoption. Appropriates funds to Council. (HB637 CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Building Codes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 141, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 141, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 182). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 182) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takumi, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-17 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 707). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Kim, Baker, Taniguchi Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1551) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-17 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO, CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 138). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB634 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.