HI HB636 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation for staffing, commissioner inter-island travel, and other related operating expenses associated with the small business regulatory review board under the Department of Business, Economic Development and Tourism.
Title
Related To The Small Business Regulatory Review Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB636 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=636&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB636_.HTM |