HI HB635 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each house of the Legislature to establish, by rule, procedures that enable the legislature to use remote testimony at legislative committee hearings to enable the public to present oral testimony at committee hearings and accommodate persons with disabilities. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Legislative Access Through Remote Testimony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB811 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB635 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB635 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=635&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB635_.HTM |