HI HB631 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB631
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes each county to impose a surcharge on transient accommodations tax. Changes the transient accommodations tax rate to an unspecified amount. Repeals the distribution of transit accommodations tax revenues to the counties. (HB631 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 208). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1002), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB631 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM.