HI HB629 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1374).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a medical release program within the Department of Public Safety for certain ill, disabled, or impaired inmates who pose a low risk to public safety. Takes effect on 3/1/2020. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Release.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1374).
2019-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1374).
2019-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-30SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880).
2019-04-30SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 876).
2019-04-26HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-26HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takayama, San Buenaventura, Gates Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads, Riviere Co-Chairs; Baker, Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 766) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1937) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1412) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:35PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateRe-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to PSM/CPH, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 65).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 855), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 71) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback