HI HB627 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 955).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires noncandidate committees and other persons who make independent expenditures supporting or opposing a candidate to report expenditures in support or opposition. Requires the Campaign Spending Commission to post independent expenditure information for each candidate on the Commission's website. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Campaign Finance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 955).
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Discharged.
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 765) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1915) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1361) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 206).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback