HI HB625 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an annual general excise tax holiday for consumers and businesses for items with a retail price under $2,000; provided that businesses pass savings on to consumers.
Title
Relating To The General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. David Alcos [R] | Rep. Diamond Garcia [R] | Rep. Elijah Pierick [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB625 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=625&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB625_.HTM |