HI HB620 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; English Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to OMH, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1576) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kim. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-16-17 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 129). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Lowen, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Fukumoto. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-02 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB620 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 225.