HI HB619 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Re-establishes and revitalizes the DOCARE Volunteer Officer Program by recruiting and training new officers. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Conservation And Resources Enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB619 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=619&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB619_.HTM |