HI HB615 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB615
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Board of Education to invite the exclusive representative for Bargaining Unit (5) (teachers and other personnel of the Department of Education) to appoint a nonvoting public school teacher representative to the Board. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, C. Lee, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Gates, Okimoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 763) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere, L. Thielen. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU/LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 393). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 01-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB615 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).