HI HB608 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB608
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dedicates one-half of one per cent of all state fund appropriations for capital improvements designated for the construction or renovation of state buildings to student art programs within the Department of Education.
Title
Relating To Department Of Education Funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TIA, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB608 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TIA, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=608&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB608_.HTM |