HI HB603 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB603

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the exemption of persons with disabilities from minimum wage requirements. Takes effect on 1/1/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB793 (Same As)
HB603 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback