HI HB603 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB603
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the exemption of persons with disabilities from minimum wage requirements. Takes effect on 1/1/2022.
Title
Relating To The Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB603 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB793 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Act 055, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
SB793 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Act 055, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=603&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB603_.HTM |