HI HB602 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB602
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the procedure of transferring the title or ownership interest in a vehicle. Requires the transferor, or transferor's representative with the appropriate documentation, and transferee to be appear in person before the clerk of the respective county department of motor vehicles to execute the transfer of title. Exempts licensed dealers from appearing in person with the transferee to execute such transfer.
Title
Relating To Registration Of Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB602 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB602 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=602&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB602_.HTM |