HI HB592 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB592
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the existing plant and animal declaration form to also require in-bound travelers to the State to acknowledge federal and state laws, and individual responsibility to protect the environment and agriculture of the State. Requires all other documents travelers are required to complete to enter the State, except documents only relating to a dangerous communicable disease, to include an environmental and agricultural affirmation. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental And Agricultural Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Rachele Fernandez Lamosao [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 118) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, Lamosao, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pierick. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Thursday, 02-02-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to TOU, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB592 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB58 (Same As) 2023-01-20 - Referred to AEN/EET, JDC.
SB58 (Same As) 2023-01-20 - Referred to AEN/EET, JDC.
Subjects
Declaration Form
Department of Agriculture
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Environmental and Agricultural Affirmation
Tourism
Department of Agriculture
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Environmental and Agricultural Affirmation
Tourism