HI HB590 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB590

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defines digital media account. Prohibits contracts that prohibit, limit, or restrict the transfer of a digital media account upon the account holder's death. Provides for the transfer of a decedent's digital media account to a devisee or heir.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Digital Media.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HET, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB590 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback