HI HB590 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB590
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Creative Industries Advisory Group while retaining the Film Industry Branch and Creative Industries Division of DBEDT. Repeals the Hawaii Television and Film Development Board along with the grant and venture capital programs that were implemented by the Board. Renames the Hawaii Television and Film Development Special Fund as the Creative Media and Film Infrastructure Special Fund. Expands funding sources for the Creative Media and Film Infrastructure Special Fund to support creative industries development within DBEDT. Amends the purposes for which the Creative Media and Film Infrastructure Special Fund may be used. Provides general excise and use tax exemptions for operations and improvements of the Hawaii Film Studio. Requires the University of Hawaii and DBEDT to report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2038. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Creative Media Industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 119). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 896), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB590 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Creative Media and Film Infrastructure Special Fund
Creative Media Industry
General Excise Tax
Use Tax
Creative Media and Film Infrastructure Special Fund
Creative Media Industry
General Excise Tax
Use Tax