HI HB584 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the types of business activity eligible for participation in Hawaii's enterprise zone program to include production of electricity from a biomass energy facility. (HB584 HD2)
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to ETT/TRE, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 257). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Lowen, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Thursday, 02-15-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-05 | House | Re-referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2018-02-05 | House | Recommitted to EDB with none voting no and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused. |
2018-02-05 | House | Recommends recommittal to EDB. |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62-18) as amended in HD 1. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-02-18 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EDB, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB584 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to EDB, referral sheet 3