HI HB583 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation for administrative and operational costs. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; L. Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Luke Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 582) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3571) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2987) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 46). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-14-18 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-12 | House | Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2018-02-12 | House | Recommitted to EDB with none voting no and Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan, Souki excused. |
2018-02-12 | House | Recommends recommittal to EDB. |
2018-02-12 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 290-18) as amended in HD 1. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-09-18 11:11AM in conference room 309. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EDB, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB583 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to EDB, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Administrative Costs
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Operational Costs
Technology
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Operational Costs
Technology