HI HB58 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
From 1/1/2022 through 12/31/2023, temporarily suspends certain general excise and use tax exemptions. Increases conveyance taxes for the sale of non-commercial properties valued at $4,000,000 or greater. Effective 1/1/2022. (HB58 CD1)
Title
Relating To State Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/06/2021 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/21/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, McDermott, Tokioka, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Misalucha. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 172). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 172) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kidani, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Nakamura, Luke, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:30PM in conference room CR 211. |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:30AM in conference room CR 211. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 811). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Kidani added as Conferee. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nakamura, Luke Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Moriwaki, Wakai. |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 642) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Misalucha, San Buenaventura. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1561) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-31-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 337) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, McDermott. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:15AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |