HI HB576 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB576
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the feeding of excessive numbers of feral birds. Provides exceptions. Establishes penalties. Creates temporary feral bird control task force to develop enforcement plan. (HB576 HD1)
Title
Relating To Birds.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB576 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).