HI HB571 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a condominium hotel developer's public report to disclose past years' general excise taxes and transient accommodations taxes for converted condominium hotels. Requires that each condominium hotel operator file an annual report with the real estate commission. (HB571 HD1)
Title
Condominium Conversions; Condominium Hotel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan, McKelvey, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-04-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to TOU, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB541 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.