HI HB570 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:45PM in conference room CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:45PM in conference room CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the time period by which a civil action for childhood sexual abuse may be initiated. Extends the period during which a victim of childhood sexual abuse may bring an otherwise time-barred action against the victim's abuser or a legal entity having a duty of care. Allows recovery of treble damages in certain circumstances. Provides for training on trauma-informed response. Applies retroactively to 4/24/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sexual Abuse Of Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:45PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 3:00PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakashima, Tam Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 693) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Riviere, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 905), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 390) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB570 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:45PM in conference room CR 329.
SB833 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JDC.
SB833 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JDC.