HI HB570 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the prohibition on the modification of the exhaust system of a moped that amplifies or increases the noise emitted by the muffler originally installed on the moped. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
Transportation; Mopeds; Mufflers; Noise Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=570&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB570_.HTM |