HI HB563 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a sex offender from residing within two thousand feet of the sex offender's former victim or the victim's immediate family members. Requires the covered offender to receive approval from the Attorney General prior to a change in address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sex Offenders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB826 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback