HI HB561 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 106, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 106, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires dentists who administer anesthesia or sedation to post contact information to verify licensure and authorization to administer anesthesia and sedation. Specifies requirements, including inspections, for written authorization or permit to administer anesthesia or sedation. (HB561 CD1)
Title
Relating To Dentistry.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 106, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 106, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 39). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 39) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takumi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Kidani. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 398). |
2017-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 405) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ruderman, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-17. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 274). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-02-24 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 514) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |