HI HB557 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the employees' retirement system to reevaluate its investments in coal, oil, natural gas, oil or natural gas services, and pipeline companies and over the next five years, divest of holdings in any companies that have a majority of its holdings invested in fossil fuels, rather than clean renewable energy sources. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 244) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).