HI HB557 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-13-19 3:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-13-19 3:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the criteria for granting a solar water heater system variance. Authorizes the Director of DBEDT to impose penalties and fines for false statements on variance applications. (HB557 HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-13-19 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-13-19 3:00PM in conference room 325.