HI HB555 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB555

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires state agencies to participate in a carbon removal program to reduce carbon emissions caused by their employees' air travel. Requires DLNR to establish and administer a state employees air travel carbon removal program that imposes a fee to implement carbon removal projects. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Environment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2020-02-04HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-30HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-23HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-30-20 11:30AM in conference room 325.
2020-01-23HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-30-20 11:30am.
2020-01-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-23-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EEP, FIN , referral sheet 4
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB129 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB555 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP, FIN , referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback