HI HB554 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB554
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sellers to disclose whether the real property lies within the sea level rise exposure area designated by the Hawaii climate change mitigation and adaptation commission or its successor. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Real Property Transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPN. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 230). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB554 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
SB503 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
SB503 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL, CPN.