HI HB553 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an offense of knowingly capturing, entangling, or killing a shark in state marine waters, and provides penalties and fines. Provides certain exemptions. Requires the department of land and natural resources to establish rules to achieve certain objectives. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Protection Of Sharks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
2021-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-18HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2021-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseRe-referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseReferred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB504 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback