HI HB553 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB553
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the court may appoint one qualified examiner instead of three, to evaluate a criminal defendant's fitness to proceed or regaining fitness to proceed in all penal cases and removes the requirement that examiner shall be from within the Department of Health. On July 1, 2022, the requirement shall be three qualified examiners for felony cases and one examiner in non-felony cases. One of the examiners shall be from within the Department of Health. (HB553 HD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal Defendants' Fitness To Proceed.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL, CPH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB553 (Carry Over) 2017-03-10 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.